KY SCR110 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 28 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Enrolled on February 28 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Urge the Kentucky Department of Agriculture to maintain lines of communication and cooperation with the United States Department of Agriculture in monitoring the livestock industry in the state.
Title
Urge the Kentucky Department of Agriculture to maintain lines of communication and cooperation with the United States Department of Agriculture in monitoring the livestock industry in the state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-10 | signed by Governor | |
2011-02-28 | delivered to Governor | |
2011-02-28 | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer | |
2011-02-28 | received in Senate | |
2011-02-25 | 3rd reading, adopted 96-0 | |
2011-02-24 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 25, 2011 | |
2011-02-24 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2011-02-23 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2011-02-22 | posting waived | |
2011-02-22 | to Agriculture & Small Business (H) | |
2011-02-18 | received in House | |
2011-02-17 | adopted 34-0 | |
2011-02-17 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 17, 2011 | |
2011-02-17 | reported favorably, to Rules | |
2011-02-15 | to Agriculture (S) | |
2011-02-11 | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/SC110.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/SC110/bill.doc |