KY SCR10 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-07 - to Judiciary (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-07 - to Judiciary (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Direct the staff of the Legislative Research Commission to study Kentucky Adult Drug Court program participant demographics and associated statistical data; direct that findings be reported to the Legislative Research Commission, for distribution to the appropriate committee or committees, by December 1, 2016.
Title
Direct the staff of the Legislative Research Commission to study Kentucky Adult Drug Court program participant demographics and associated statistical data; direct that findings be reported to the Legislative Research Commission, for distribution to the appropriate committee or committees, by December 1, 2016.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Buford [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-07 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2016-01-05 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
2015-12-11 | Senate | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/SCR10.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/SC10/bill.doc |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/SC10/bill.pdf |