KY SB9 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 020)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 020)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create new sections of KRS Chapter 311 to require a person who intends to perform an abortion to determine whether the unborn human individual has a detectable fetal heartbeat; prohibit a person from performing an abortion before determining whether the unborn human individual has a detectable fetal heartbeat; prohibit a person from performing an abortion after the detection of a fetal heartbeat; provide exceptions for medical emergencies; require documentation of whether an abortion was performed to preserve the health of the pregnant woman; specify that nothing in the Act restricts access to contraceptives; allow a woman to file a civil action for the wrongful death of her unborn child; require the Cabinet for Health and Family Services to inspect the medical records of a facility that performs abortions to ensure compliance with reporting requirements; permit the Attorney General to apply to a state or federal court for a declaration that the Act's provisions are constitutional, or an order lifting an injunction if one exists, if federal abortion law changes; amend KRS 311.595 to allow the Kentucky Board of Medical Licensure to suspend or revoke the license of any physician for violations; amend KRS 311.990 to establish criminal penalties for violations; amend KRS 213.101 to expand the statistical reporting system for abortions; allow for severability; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to abortion and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 366 (Y: 71 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 803 (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 803 (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-15 | Senate | signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 020) |
2019-03-14 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2019-03-14 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2019-03-14 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2019-03-14 | Senate | received in Senate |
2019-03-14 | House | passed 71-19 |
2019-03-14 | House | floor amendment (4) defeated |
2019-03-14 | House | 3rd reading |
2019-03-13 | House | floor amendment (4) filed |
2019-03-06 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 7, 2019 |
2019-02-28 | House | floor amendments (1), (2) and (3) filed |
2019-02-28 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-27 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2019-02-21 | House | posted in committee |
2019-02-19 | House | to Veterans, Military Affairs, and Public Protection (H) |
2019-02-15 | House | received in House |
2019-02-14 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 31-6 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 14, 2019 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules |
2019-01-09 | Senate | returned to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2019-01-09 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2019-01-09 | Senate | taken from Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2019-01-08 | Senate | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2019-01-08 | Senate | returned to Committee on Committees (S) |
2019-01-08 | Senate | 1st reading |
2019-01-08 | Senate | taken from Committee on Committees (S) |
2019-01-08 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Administrative Regulations and Proceedings
Children and Minors
Civil Actions
Civil Procedure
Civil Rights
Corrections Impact
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Procedure
Effective Dates, Emergency
Health and Medical Services
Local Mandate
Parental Rights
Physicians and Practitioners
Reproductive Issues
Children and Minors
Civil Actions
Civil Procedure
Civil Rights
Corrections Impact
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Procedure
Effective Dates, Emergency
Health and Medical Services
Local Mandate
Parental Rights
Physicians and Practitioners
Reproductive Issues