KY SB86 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 20)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 45.750 to increase the dollar minimum from $600,000 to $1,000,000 for the definition of "capital projects" for entities other than institutions of higher education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to capital projects.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 266 (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SCS 1 RSN# 407 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 407 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-23Senatesigned by Governor (Acts, ch. 20)
2018-03-12Senatedelivered to Governor
2018-03-12Senateenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2018-03-12Senateenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2018-03-12Senatereceived in Senate
2018-03-09House3rd reading, passed 84-0
2018-03-08Houseposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 9, 2018
2018-03-07House2nd reading, to Rules
2018-03-06Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2018-02-08Houseposted in committee
2018-02-06Houseto Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2018-02-02Housereceived in House
2018-02-01Senate3rd reading, passed 38-0 with Committee Substitute (1)
2018-02-01Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 1, 2018
2018-01-31Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2018-01-30Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2018-01-18Senateto Appropriations & Revenue (S)
2018-01-17Senateintroduced in Senate

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback