KY SB78 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-13 - to Judiciary (H)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-13 - to Judiciary (H)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 258.095 to amend the definition of who qualifies as the owner of a dog to include persons permitting the dog to remain on or about premises owned and occupied by the person.
Title
AN ACT relating to dogs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-13 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2014-02-11 | House | received in House |
2014-02-10 | Senate | passed 29-8 |
2014-02-10 | Senate | floor amendment (1) defeated |
2014-02-10 | Senate | 3rd reading |
2014-02-10 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 10, 2014 |
2014-01-30 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed |
2014-01-29 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-01-28 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2014-01-16 | Senate | to Agriculture (S) |
2014-01-14 | Senate | introduced in Senate |