KY SB7 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-11 - floor amendment (3) filed to HFA (1)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-11 - floor amendment (3) filed to HFA (1)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 311.720 to define "abortion services"; amend KRS 311.715 to define "affiliate", to provide that public funds shall not be paid to any entity or affiliate of an entity that provides abortion services, and to establish exceptions.
Title
AN ACT relating to the use of public resources.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-11 | House | floor amendment (3) filed to HFA (1) |
2016-02-09 | House | floor amendments (1) and (2-title) filed |
2016-02-05 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2016-02-04 | House | returned to Committee on Committees (H) |
2016-02-04 | House | 1st reading |
2016-02-04 | House | taken from Committee on Committees (H) |
2016-02-04 | House | received in House |
2016-02-02 | Senate | passed 33-5 with Committee Substitute (1), floor amendment (2) |
2016-02-02 | Senate | floor amendment (1) withdrawn |
2016-02-02 | Senate | 3rd reading |
2016-02-01 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 2 |
2016-01-27 | Senate | floor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute |
2016-01-25 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2016-01-25 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-01-21 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2016-01-07 | Senate | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2016-01-06 | Senate | introduced in Senate |