KY SB66 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-23 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 90)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-23 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 90)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 194A.380 to establish a definition of "staff member" as it relates to persons working or volunteering at a youth camp; amend KRS 194A.382 to create employment and background check standards for a staff member working or volunteering at a youth camp; and amend KRS 194A.383 related to violations of employment requirements of a staff member working or volunteering at a youth camp.
Title
AN ACT relating to youth camps.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/FINAL fccr RSN# 1732 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 321 (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 232 (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1560 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 321 (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 232 (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1560 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-23 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 90) |
2021-03-16 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2021-03-16 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2021-03-16 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Bill passed 33-0 |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Free Conference Committee report adopted in Senate |
2021-03-15 | Senate | posted for passage for consideration of Free Conference Report |
2021-03-15 | Senate | to Rules (S) |
2021-03-15 | Senate | received in Senate |
2021-03-15 | House | Bill passed 91-0 |
2021-03-15 | House | Free Conference Committee report adopted in House |
2021-03-15 | House | Free Conference Committee appointed in House and Senate |
2021-03-15 | House | Conference Committee report adopted in House and Senate |
2021-03-15 | House | Conference Committee report filed in House and Senate |
2021-03-15 | House | Conference Committee appointed in Senate |
2021-03-12 | House | Conference Committee appointed in House |
2021-03-12 | House | House refused to recede from Committee Substitute (1) |
2021-03-12 | House | posted for passage for receding from House Committee Substitute (1) |
2021-03-12 | House | taken from Rules (H) |
2021-03-12 | House | to Rules (H) |
2021-03-12 | House | received in House |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Senate refused to concur in House Committee Substitute (1) |
2021-03-11 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2021-03-11 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1) on Thursday, March 11, 2021 |
2021-03-05 | Senate | to Rules (S) |
2021-03-05 | Senate | received in Senate |
2021-03-05 | House | 3rd reading, passed 93-0 with Committee Substitute |
2021-03-04 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 5, 2021 |
2021-03-04 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-03-03 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2021-03-02 | House | posted in committee |
2021-03-01 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2021-02-24 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-02-24 | House | received in House |
2021-02-23 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 23, 2021 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-02-10 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2021-01-13 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2021-01-05 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2021-01-05 | Senate | introduced in Senate |