KY SB58 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-26 - 2nd reading, to Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-26 - 2nd reading, to Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Propose to amend Section 77 of the Constitution of Kentucky by prohibiting the Governor's ability to grant pardons or commute sentences beginning 30 days prior to a gubernatorial election and ending at that gubernatorial inauguration; amend Section 240 of the Constitution of Kentucky to conform; submit to voters.
Title
AN ACT proposing to amend Sections 77 and 240 of the Constitution of Kentucky relating to limiting the Governor's ability to grant pardons and commute sentences.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1253 (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-26 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-03-19 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-03-05 | House | posted in committee |
2020-03-02 | House | to Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H) |
2020-02-27 | House | received in House |
2020-02-26 | Senate | passed 33-4 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | floor amendment (1) defeated |
2020-02-26 | Senate | 3rd reading |
2020-02-25 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2020-02-24 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed |
2020-02-21 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 25, 2020 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-02-19 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-01-08 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2020-01-07 | Senate | introduced in Senate |