KY SB45 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 134)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 134)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 304.17A-164 to redefine "cost sharing" and define "generic alternative," "health plan," "insured," and "person"; prohibit an insurer or pharmacy benefit manager from excluding any cost-sharing amount paid by or or behalf of an insured when calculating the insured's contribution to any applicable cost-sharing requirement; exempt fully insured or self-insured health benefit plans provided to state employees under KRS 18A.225; EFFECTIVE January 1, 2022.
Title
AN ACT relating to prescription drugs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1738 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 283 (Y: 89 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs 1 RSN# 1587 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 283 (Y: 89 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs 1 RSN# 1587 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 134) |
2021-03-16 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2021-03-16 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2021-03-16 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Bill passed 35-0 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1) |
2021-03-15 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1) for Tuesday, March 16, 2021 |
2021-03-12 | Senate | to Rules (S) |
2021-03-12 | Senate | received in Senate |
2021-03-12 | House | 3rd reading, passed 89-8 with Committee Substitute |
2021-03-11 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 12, 2021 |
2021-03-04 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-03-03 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2021-03-01 | House | posted in committee |
2021-03-01 | House | to Banking & Insurance (H) |
2021-03-01 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-03-01 | House | received in House |
2021-02-26 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 with Committee Substitute |
2021-02-25 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 26, 2021 |
2021-02-24 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-02-23 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | to Banking & Insurance (S) |
2021-01-05 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2021-01-05 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |