KY SB4 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Passed on February 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-04 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 1)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Passed on February 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-04 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 1)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 311 to specify how the phrase "individual, private setting" shall be interpreted in informed consent situations.
Title
AN ACT relating to full disclosure in public safety.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-04 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 1) |
2016-02-02 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2016-02-02 | Senate | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2016-02-01 | Senate | passed 33-5 |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Committee Substitutes (1) floor amendment (1) |
2016-01-29 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitutes (1) floor amendment (1) |
2016-01-29 | Senate | received in Senate |
2016-01-28 | House | passed 92-3 with Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendment (1) |
2016-01-28 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2016-01-28 | House | Committee Substitute adopted |
2016-01-28 | House | 3rd reading |
2016-01-28 | House | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) |
2016-01-28 | House | posting waived |
2016-01-25 | House | to Health & Welfare (H) |
2016-01-21 | House | returned to Committee on Committees (H) |
2016-01-21 | House | 2nd reading |
2016-01-21 | House | taken from Committee on Committees (H) |
2016-01-20 | House | returned to Committee on Committees (H) |
2016-01-20 | House | 1st reading |
2016-01-20 | House | taken from Committee on Committees (H) |
2016-01-19 | House | received in House |
2016-01-19 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 32-5 |
2016-01-15 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, January 19 |
2016-01-14 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-01-13 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2016-01-07 | Senate | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2016-01-06 | Senate | introduced in Senate |