KY SB35 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-11 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 10)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-11 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 10)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 116.200 to establish a deadline of January 1, 2011, for cities and school boards to submit to the county clerk a list of properties and boundaries and changes to boundaries; permit electronic transmission of information, including maps; prohibit county clerks from charging a fee to cities or school boards; permit county clerks to request more information if necessary in order to maintain the voting roster; amend KRS 81A.470 to eliminate the requirement that certain documents be filed in the Governor's Office for Local Development; amend KRS 81A.475 to conform.
Title
AN ACT relating to the necessary information to be provided to the county clerks to maintain a roster of voters who are eligible to vote in city and school board elections.
Sponsors
Sen. Alice Kerr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-11 | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 10) | |
2010-03-04 | delivered to Governor | |
2010-03-04 | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer | |
2010-03-03 | received in Senate | |
2010-03-02 | 3rd reading, passed 99-0 | |
2010-02-24 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 25, 2010 | |
2010-02-24 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-02-23 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | |
2010-02-16 | posted in committee | |
2010-02-08 | to Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H) | |
2010-02-01 | received in House | |
2010-01-28 | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 | |
2010-01-27 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, January 28, 2010 | |
2010-01-21 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-01-20 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2010-01-06 | to State & Local Government (S) | |
2010-01-05 | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/SB35.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/SB35/bill.doc |