KY SB3 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on January 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-09 - signed by Governor ((Acts, ch. 004)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on January 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-09 - signed by Governor ((Acts, ch. 004)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 61.661, 161.585, and 21.540 to require the disclosure, upon request, of the retirement benefit information of current and former members of the General Assembly, including the member's name, status, and projected or actual retirement benefit payments and benefits from the Kentucky Retirement Systems, the Kentucky Teachers' Retirement System, the Legislators' Retirement Plan, and the Judicial Retirement Plan.
Title
AN ACT relating to the disclosure of public retirement information.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-09 | House | signed by Governor ((Acts, ch. 004) |
2017-01-07 | House | delivered to Governor |
2017-01-07 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2017-01-07 | House | received in House |
2017-01-07 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2017-01-07 | Senate | received in Senate |
2017-01-07 | House | 3rd reading, passed 95-1 |
2017-01-07 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Saturday, January 7, 2017 |
2017-01-07 | House | reported favorably, to Rules |
2017-01-06 | House | returned to State Government (H) |
2017-01-06 | House | 2nd reading |
2017-01-06 | House | taken from State Government (H) |
2017-01-05 | House | posting waived |
2017-01-05 | House | returned to State Government (H) |
2017-01-05 | House | 1st reading |
2017-01-05 | House | taken from State Government (H) |
2017-01-05 | House | to State Government (H) |
2017-01-05 | House | received in House |
2017-01-05 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 with committee amendments (1-title) and Committee Substitute (1) |
2017-01-05 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, January 5, 2017 |
2017-01-05 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with committee amendments (1-title) and Committee Substitute (1) |
2017-01-04 | Senate | returned to State & Local Government (S) |
2017-01-04 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2017-01-04 | Senate | taken from State & Local Government (S) |
2017-01-03 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2017-01-03 | Senate | returned to Committee on Committees (S) |
2017-01-03 | Senate | 1st reading |
2017-01-03 | Senate | taken from Committee on Committees (S) |
2017-01-03 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
2016-11-16 | Senate | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |