KY SB29 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 053)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 053)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 243.075 to allow cities with a population of less than 20,000 and counties that do not have a city with a population greater than 20,000 to impose a regulatory license fee of no more than 6% on the sale of alcoholic beverages; license fees imposed under KRS 243.075 before the effective date of this Act.
Title
AN ACT relating to licensing fees for the sale of alcoholic beverages.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 303 (Y: 96 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1, sfa 1 RSN# 857 (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1, sfa 1 RSN# 857 (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-22 | Senate | signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 053) |
2019-03-13 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2019-03-13 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2019-03-13 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2019-03-13 | Senate | received in Senate |
2019-03-12 | House | 3rd reading, passed 96-4 |
2019-03-07 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-03-06 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2019-02-28 | House | posted in committee |
2019-02-27 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2019-02-26 | House | received in House |
2019-02-26 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 30-5 with Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendment (1) |
2019-02-25 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2019-02-22 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2019-02-22 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2019-02-21 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 22, 2019 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-19 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-02-14 | Senate | reassigned to Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S) |
2019-01-09 | Senate | to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S) |
2019-01-08 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages
Cities
Distilled Spirits
Fees
Licensing
Local Mandate
Malt Beverages
Wines and Wineries
Cities
Distilled Spirits
Fees
Licensing
Local Mandate
Malt Beverages
Wines and Wineries