KY SB281 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - recommitted to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S)
Pending: Senate Licensing, Occupations & Administrative Regulations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 241.010 to define "direct shipper" and amend the definitions of "retail sale" and "sale"; create a new section of KRS Chapter 243 to establish a direct shipper license and penalties for violations; amend KRS 243.030 to establish the license fee for a direct shipper license; amend KRS 243.120 to allow a Kentucky winery to ship to a consumer; amend KRS 243.130 to allow for the direct shipper license; amend KRS 243.155 to remove the in-person requirement for wine purchases and to conform with direct shipper license privileges; amend KRS 244.165 to specify the privileges for a Kentucky-licensed small farm winery or winery; add the direct shippers license privileges; amend KRS 243.034 and 243.0341 to conform; provide severability provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to direct shipment of wine to consumers.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-15Senaterecommitted to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S)
2020-03-11Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2020-03-10Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2020-03-06Senateto Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S)
2020-03-04Senateintroduced in Senate

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback