KY SB278 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-16 - to Education (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-16 - to Education (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 156 to require the Kentucky Board of Education to promulgate administrative regulations to establish an elective social studies course on the Hebrew Scriptures, Old Testament of the Bible, the New Testament, or a combination of the Hebrew Scriptures and the New Testament of the Bible; require that the course provide students knowledge of biblical content, characters, poetry, and narratives that are prerequisites to understanding contemporary society and culture, including literature, art, music, mores, oratory, and public policy; permit students to use various translations of the Bible for the course; amend KRS 158.197 to permit a school council to offer an elective social studies course on the Hebrew Scriptures, Old Testament of the Bible, the New Testament, or a combination of the Hebrew Scriptures and the New Testament of the Bible.
Title
AN ACT relating to Bible literacy courses in the public schools.
Sponsors
Sen. Robin Webb [D] | Sen. Danny Carroll [R] | Sen. C.B. Embry [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-16 | House | to Education (H) |
2016-03-15 | House | received in House |
2016-03-14 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 35-3 |
2016-03-11 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 14, 2016 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules as a Consent Bill |
2016-03-09 | Senate | returned to Education (S) |
2016-03-09 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2016-03-09 | Senate | taken from Education (S) |
2016-03-07 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2016-03-07 | Senate | returned to Committee on Committees (S) |
2016-03-07 | Senate | 1st reading |
2016-03-07 | Senate | taken from Committee on Committees (S) |
2016-03-03 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2016-03-03 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/SB278.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/SB278/bill.pdf |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/SB278/vote_history.pdf |