KY SB261 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - to Committee on Committees (H)
Pending: House Committee On Committees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - to Committee on Committees (H)
Pending: House Committee On Committees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create new sections of KRS Chapter 150 to define "compensatory mitigation," "compensatory mitigation project," "compensatory mitigation site," "DA permit," "mitigation credit," " in-lieu fee program," "in-lieu fee program instrument," "mitigation bank," "mitigation credit," "service area," and "mitigation liability"; re-establish the Kentucky wetland and stream mitigation fund in a newly created section; require funds representing an unsatisfied liability under the 2008 Mitigation Rule issued by the Department of Army to be put out for contract under KRS Chapter 45A; require the Department of Fish and Wildlife Resources to make a report to the LRC that describes the in-lieu fee program and unsatisfied liabilities in service areas by December 1 of each year; allow the state to hold a permanent easement in lands acquired by it or proposed to it by a mitigation bank; require entities to have financial surety; amend KRS 150.255 to specify how governmental and non-governmental agencies satisfy compensatory mitigation; stipulate that when the unsatisfied mitigation liability reaches 2 million dollars the in-lieu fee program shall purchase credits or issue an RFP for a commodity purchase; specify the procurement for full-delivery and the actions for mitigation on the site under the full-delivery approach; allow for compensatory mitigation to be a capital construction project with the Commonwealth holding a conservation easement or some other environmental covenant or restriction; identify requirements for responsive bidders; APPROPRIATION.
Title
AN ACT relating to stream and wetland mitigation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1654 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-03-11 | House | received in House |
2021-03-05 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 with Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title) |
2021-03-04 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 5, 2021 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-03-03 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title) |
2021-02-24 | Senate | to Natural Resources & Energy (S) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Appropriations
Deeds and Conveyances
Environment and Conservation
Fish and Wildlife
Forests and Forestry
Land Use
Pollution
State Agencies
Waterways and Dams
Deeds and Conveyances
Environment and Conservation
Fish and Wildlife
Forests and Forestry
Land Use
Pollution
State Agencies
Waterways and Dams