KY SB251 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - returned to Natural Resources & Energy (H)
Pending: House Natural Resources & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 351.010 so that open-pit mines do not include any excavation made from a refuse fill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to mining.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 1330 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-26Housereturned to Natural Resources & Energy (H)
2020-03-26House2nd reading
2020-03-26Housetaken from Natural Resources & Energy (H)
2020-03-26Houseposting waived
2020-03-19Housereturned to Natural Resources & Energy (H)
2020-03-19House1st reading
2020-03-19Housetaken from Natural Resources & Energy (H)
2020-03-19Houseto Natural Resources & Energy (H)
2020-03-18Housereceived in House
2020-03-17Senate3rd reading, passed 32-0 with Committee Substitute (1)
2020-03-17Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 17, 2020
2020-03-12Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2020-03-11Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2020-03-05Senateto Natural Resources & Energy (S)
2020-03-03Senateintroduced in Senate

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback