KY SB241 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 142)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 142)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 150.170 to exempt current and former members of the Armed Forces and certified peace officers from the live-fire component of the hunter education course.
Title
AN ACT relating to hunter education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - House - House: Veto Override RCS# 497 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2137 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2137 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 142) |
2022-03-30 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2022-03-30 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2022-03-30 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2022-03-30 | Senate | received in Senate |
2022-03-30 | House | 3rd reading, passed 98-0 |
2022-03-30 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 30, 2022 |
2022-03-29 | House | returned to Rules |
2022-03-29 | House | taken from the Orders of the Day |
2022-03-24 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 25, 2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-03-22 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2022-03-18 | House | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (H) |
2022-03-16 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-03-16 | House | received in House |
2022-03-16 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2022-03-14 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 16, 2022 |
2022-03-11 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill |
2022-03-10 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2022-03-01 | Senate | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Environment and Conservation
Firearms and Weapons
Fish and Wildlife
Hunting and Fishing
Licensing
Military Affairs and Civil Defense
Peace Officers and Law Enforcement
Safety
Veterans
Firearms and Weapons
Fish and Wildlife
Hunting and Fishing
Licensing
Military Affairs and Civil Defense
Peace Officers and Law Enforcement
Safety
Veterans