KY SB238 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-22 - to Judiciary (H)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-22 - to Judiciary (H)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 311.601, 311.844, 311A.120, and 314.073 to require training on awareness of sexual violence for physicians, physician assistants, nurses, and emergency medical technicians.
Title
AN ACT relating to sexual violence training.
Sponsors
Sen. Denise Harper Angel [D] | Sen. Whitney Westerfield [R] | Sen. Julie Raque Adams [R] | Sen. Danny Carroll [R] |
Sen. Alice Kerr [R] | Sen. Reginald Thomas [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 630 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2018-03-22 | House | received in House |
2018-03-22 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 22, 2018 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-03-19 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2018-03-05 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/18RS/SB238.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/SB238/bill.pdf |
Roll Call | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/18RS/SB238/vote_history.pdf |