KY SB23 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-25 - taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #5) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-25 - taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #5) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS 367.363 to 367.365 to define "protected person," "representative," and "sufficient proof of authority"; require a consumer reporting agency to place a security freeze on a protected person's record or report upon proper request by a representative; require the freeze to be placed within ten days of receiving the request; set forth when the credit reporting agency is required to remove the freeze; allow the credit reporting agency to charge a fee under certain circumstances; establish penalties for violations.
Title
AN ACT relating to credit freezes for protected consumers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-25 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day |
2016-03-25 | House | floor amendment (1), (2-title), (3) and (4-title) filed |
2016-03-24 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 25, 2016 |
2016-03-24 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-03-23 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2016-03-22 | House | posting waived |
2016-02-11 | House | to Banking & Insurance (H) |
2016-02-10 | House | received in House |
2016-02-09 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2016-02-08 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 9 |
2016-02-05 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-02-04 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2016-01-07 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2016-01-06 | Senate | introduced in Senate |