KY SB228 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - became law without Governor's Signature (Acts, ch. 205)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 164.6901 to rename KRS 164.6901 to 164.6935 the Revised Uniform Athlete Agents Act; amend KRS 164.6903 to revise the definitions of "athlete agent" and "student-athlete" and to define "educational institution," "enrolled," "interscholastic sport," "licensed, registered or certified professional," "recruit or solicit," and "sign"; amend KRS 164.6907 to clarify time period for submitting an application; amend KRS 164.6909 expand the requirements for an athlete agent application form and the registration process; amend KRS 164.6911 clarify reasons for which registration may be denied and the license renewal process; amend KRS 164.6913 to clarify reasons for refusing to issue or to suspend or revoke a registration; create a new section of KRS 164.6901 to 164.6935 to allow the department to issue a temporary license; amend KRS 164.6915 to establish a fee to renew a registration based on registration in another state; amend KRS 164.6917 to specify requirements for an agency contract; amend KRS 164.6919 to specify communication requirements an athlete agent must meet; amend KRS 164.6921 to include parents or guardians of minor student-athletes; amend KRS 164.6923 to require an athlete agent to create records; amend KRS 164.6925 to clarify actions prohibited by athlete agents; amend KRS 164.6929 to allow student-athletes as well as educational institutions to bring action for damages and increase civil penalty from $25,000 to $50,000; amend KRS 164.6933 clarify the interaction of KRS 164.6901 to 164.6935 with regard to federal electronic signatures statutes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to athlete agents.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 521 (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SFA 1 RSN# 536 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 536 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-27Senatebecame law without Governor's Signature (Acts, ch. 205)
2018-04-26Senatefiled without Governor's signature with the Secretary of State
2018-04-14Senatedelivered to Governor
2018-04-14Senateenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2018-04-14Senateenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2018-04-14Senatereceived in Senate
2018-04-14House3rd reading, passed 82-0
2018-03-27Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 29, 2018
2018-03-27House2nd reading, to Rules
2018-03-22Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute & committee amendment (1-title)
2018-03-20Houseposted in committee
2018-03-19Houseto Education (H)
2018-03-15Housereceived in House
2018-03-14Senate3rd reading, passed 35-0 with floor amendment (1)
2018-03-13Senatepassed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
2018-03-13Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 13, 2018
2018-03-09Senatefloor amendment (1) filed
2018-03-09Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2018-03-08Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2018-03-01Senateto Education (S)
2018-02-28Senateintroduced in Senate

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback