KY SB225 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - recommitted to Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S)
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Create new sections of KRS Chapter 99 to define "abandoned and blighted property," "actively marketed," "building," "competent entity," "conservator," "conservator's fee," "costs of rehabilitation," "historic structure," "immediate family," "local government," "owner," "party in interest," "rehabilitation," and "vacant"; establish the guidelines for filing and serving a petition for the appointment of a conservator to take possession of and undertake the rehabilitation of an abandoned or blighted property and the procedure for hearing the petition; establish the powers and duties of the conservator; provide for the submission of a plan by the conservator to rehabilitate, demolish, or sell the abandoned and blighted property; establish standards for termination of the conservatorship; establish the short title of "Abandoned and Blighted Property Conservatorship Act"; EFFECTIVE January 1, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to abandoned and blighted property.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-15Senaterecommitted to Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S)
2020-03-18Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2020-03-17Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2020-03-02Senateto Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S)
2020-02-27Senateintroduced in Senate

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback