KY SB214 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-27 - to Education (S)
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 158.791 to set forth the intent of the General Assembly with regard to reading instruction, supports, and interventions; define the Department of Education's role in assisting local school districts with regard to reading instruction, supports, and interventions; require the department to collaborate with designated agencies on reading programing, materials, and activities; amend KRS 158.305 to replace references to "response to intervention" systems with "multi-tiered system of supports"; require school districts to submit evidence of implementation of a multi-tiered system of supports by October 1 of each year; require department to provide technical assistance and training on multi-tiered system of supports upon the request of a school district; require the department to develop and maintain lists of approved universal screeners, diagnostic assessments, and comprehensive reading programs; require a local board of education to adopt and implement a reading universal screener and reading diagnostic assessment by January 1, 2021; permit a local school district to adopt a common comprehensive reading program for K-3; require all K-3 teachers to be trained in any reading diagnostic assessment and universal screener adopted by a local board; establish requirements for the administration of reading universal screeners by grade-level; define and establish the requirements for a reading improvement plan; require the department to establish reading teacher academies or coaching models by September 1, 2021, if funds are appropriated; create a new section of KRS Chapter 164 to require postsecondary institutions offering early childhood or elementary teacher preparation programs to include designated instruction; require the EPSB to maintain a list of approved reading teacher preparation tests; require all new teachers seeking certification in Interdisciplinary Early Childhood Education or Elementary School to take an approved reading teacher preparation test; amend KRS 164.0207 to rename the Reading Diagnostic and Intervention Grant Steering Committee the Read to Succeed Council;

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to early literacy education.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-27Senateto Education (S)
2020-02-25Senateintroduced in Senate

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback