KY SB204 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-29 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-29 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 177.905, to change the definition of "road" to include only those highways which are a part of the national highway system, thereby limiting Transportation Cabinet regulation of automobile recyclers to only those facilities visible from roads that are part of the national highway system.
Title
AN ACT relating to vehicle recyclers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 1648 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | House | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2021-03-29 | House | taken from the Orders of the Day |
2021-03-15 | House | floor amendment (2) filed |
2021-03-12 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 15, 2021 |
2021-03-12 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-03-11 | House | floor amendment (1) filed |
2021-03-11 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2021-03-05 | House | posted in committee |
2021-03-05 | House | to Transportation (H) |
2021-03-05 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-03-05 | House | received in House |
2021-03-04 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 35-1 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2021-03-03 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 4, 2021 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) as a consent bill |
2021-03-01 | Senate | returned to Transportation (S) |
2021-03-01 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2021-03-01 | Senate | taken from Transportation (S) |
2021-02-26 | Senate | returned to Transportation (S) |
2021-02-26 | Senate | 1st reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | taken from Transportation (S) |
2021-02-10 | Senate | to Transportation (S) |
2021-02-09 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2021-02-09 | Senate | introduced in Senate |