KY SB194 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-15 - recommitted to Education (S)
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-15 - recommitted to Education (S)
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 160.380 to require that school superintendents conduct a name- based background check of child abuse and neglect records maintained by the Cabinet for Health and Family Services when considering employment decisions.
Title
AN ACT relating to background checks of child abuse and neglect records.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-15 | Senate | recommitted to Education (S) |
2016-03-15 | Senate | taken from Rules |
2016-03-11 | Senate | floor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute |
2016-03-08 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2016-02-26 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-02-25 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) committee amendment (1-title) |
2016-02-22 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2016-02-18 | Senate | introduced in Senate |