KY SB190 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-25 - to Local Government (H)
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-25 - to Local Government (H)
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 441 to provide a process for the return of moneys remaining in an inmate account or prisoner canteen account after the release of a prisoner and provide that unclaimed moneys are turned over to the fiscal court after three years; amend KRS 393.010 to provide that unclaimed funds as set out in Section 1 of the Act are not under the provisions of KRS Chapter 393.
Title
AN ACT relating to unclaimed funds in the possession of jailers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | to Local Government (H) | |
2010-03-24 | received in House | |
2010-03-23 | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 | |
2010-03-22 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 23, 2010 | |
2010-03-18 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-03-17 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2010-03-05 | to State & Local Government (S) | |
2010-03-03 | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/SB190.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/SB190/bill.doc |