KY SB187 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-15 - recommitted to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
Pending: Senate Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-15 - recommitted to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
Pending: Senate Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 45.763 to exempt capital projects using the public-private partnership delivery method for the use, purchase, or acceptance of real property of any value or equipment with a value over $400,000 from authorization by the General Assembly, up to the existing limit of $25 million in KRS 45A.077; amend KRS 45A.077 to extend notice periods and time for action on unsolicited proposals for capital projects; amend KRS 65.028 to allow some members of the Kentucky Local Government Public-Private Partnership Board to send designees instead of appearing in person; exempt agreements with a value less than thirty percent of the local government general fund revenues from being submitted to the Kentucky Local Government Public-Private Partnership Board; amend KRS 175B.015 to remove the requirement for quarterly meetings of the state authority if a bi-state or project authority exists; amend KRS 175B.020 to remove the commitment to pay costs incurred in evaluation of unsolicited proposal and implement a standardized fee set by administrative regulation; require costs paid by an unsolicited proposer to be negotiated in an agreement between the state authority and the proposer; amend various statutes to prohibit proposals that seek or purport to bind any future General Assembly to appropriate any moneys.
Title
AN ACT relating to public-private partnerships.
Sponsors
Sen. George Wise [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-15 | Senate | recommitted to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2017-03-02 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title) |
2017-03-01 | Senate | reassigned to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2017-02-28 | Senate | returned to Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S) |
2017-02-28 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2017-02-28 | Senate | taken from Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S) |
2017-02-27 | Senate | returned to Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S) |
2017-02-27 | Senate | 1st reading |
2017-02-27 | Senate | taken from Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S) |
2017-02-15 | Senate | to Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S) |
2017-02-14 | Senate | introduced in Senate |