KY SB180 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-16 - floor amendments (1), (2), (3) and (4) filed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-16 - floor amendments (1), (2), (3) and (4) filed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 446 to define "protected activities," "protected activity provider," and "protected rights"; provide legislative intent; prohibit any statute, regulation, ordinance, order, judgment, of other law or action by any court, commission, or other public agency from impairing, impeding, infringing upon, or otherwise restricting the exercise of protected rights by any protected activity provider; prohibit a protected activity provider from being fined, imprisoned, held in contempt, or otherwise punished or found liable for actions or inactions related to providing or refusing to provide protected activities unless a court finds that the complaining person or the government proved by clear and convincing evidence that a compelling governmental interest in infringing upon the act or refusal to act existed and the least restrictive means was used.
Title
AN ACT relating to the protection of rights.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-16 | House | floor amendments (1), (2), (3) and (4) filed |
2016-03-16 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2016-03-15 | House | received in House |
2016-03-15 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 22-16 with floor amendment (1) |
2016-03-14 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed |
2016-03-14 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 15, 2016 |
2016-02-26 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-02-25 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2016-02-22 | Senate | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2016-02-18 | Senate | introduced in Senate |