KY SB179 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-17 - posted in committee
Pending: House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-17 - posted in committee
Pending: House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 6 to create the Kentucky General Assembly Veterans Hall of Fame; establish guidelines for introductions; provide for an executive committee and establish membership, terms of appointment, and duties.
Title
AN ACT relating to veterans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-17 | posted in committee | |
2010-03-11 | to Military Affairs & Public Safety (H) | |
2010-03-10 | received in House | |
2010-03-09 | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 | |
2010-03-08 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 9, 2010 | |
2010-03-05 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-03-04 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | |
2010-03-01 | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) | |
2010-02-26 | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/SB179.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/SB179/bill.doc |