KY SB172 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 091)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 091)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 91A.040 to move the date cities with populations greater than 2,000 are required to forward a copy of their audit report to the Department for Local Government to no later than March 1 immediately following the fiscal year being audited; allow cities with populations equal to or less than 1,000 to have an audit performed every other fiscal year and have the audit only encompass that single year and allow the electronic copy to be sent by March 1 following the fiscal year being audited; allow cities with populations exceeding 1,000 but less than 2,000 have an audit be performed every other year and have the audit encompass both years and allow the electronic copy to be sent by March 1 following the fiscal year being audited; amend KRS 424.220 to relocate language dealing with officers who are exempt from presenting financial statement; stipulate that every officer of a board, commission, or other authority of a city, county, or district who deals with any funds collected from the public prepares a report as prescribed in the section; require that in order to provide notice to the public of the completion of the city's financial statement, the appropriate officer of the city performing an audit publishes the audit report in accordance with KRS 91A.040(9) and the appropriate officer of a city not conducting an annual audit for the fiscal year under exemptions, publish a legal display advertisement and provide financial statements to various media; require the appropriate officers in counties to publish the audit in the same manner that city audits are published; amend KRS 42.460 to conform.
Title
AN ACT relating to local financial reporting.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Wilson [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 302 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 870 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 870 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | Senate | signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 091) |
2019-03-13 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2019-03-13 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2019-03-13 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2019-03-13 | Senate | received in Senate |
2019-03-12 | House | 3rd reading, passed 100-0 |
2019-03-07 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-03-06 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2019-02-28 | House | posted in committee |
2019-02-27 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2019-02-26 | House | received in House |
2019-02-26 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 26, 2019 |
2019-02-25 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules as a consent bill |
2019-02-21 | Senate | returned to State & Local Government (S) |
2019-02-21 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2019-02-21 | Senate | taken from State & Local Government (S) |
2019-02-20 | Senate | returned to State & Local Government (S) |
2019-02-20 | Senate | 1st reading |
2019-02-20 | Senate | taken from State & Local Government (S) |
2019-02-14 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Audits and Auditors
Cities
Cities, First Class
Cities, Home Rule Class
Counties
Counties with Cities of the First Class
Education, Elementary and Secondary
Financial Responsibility
Local Government
Local Mandate
Public Officers and Employees
Cities
Cities, First Class
Cities, Home Rule Class
Counties
Counties with Cities of the First Class
Education, Elementary and Secondary
Financial Responsibility
Local Government
Local Mandate
Public Officers and Employees