KY SB16 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 032)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 032)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create new sections of KRS Chapter 211 to establish the Kentucky Rare Disease Advisory Council; list members to be appointed by the Governor; state the duties of the council; require a report of council activities; create a rare disease trust fund to be administered by the Cabinet for Health and Family Services to finance the operation of the council and support rare disease research and treatment; require a report on expenditures from the fund; provide that the council shall to cease to exist on December 1, 2029, unless reestablished by the General Assembly.
Title
AN ACT establishing the Kentucky Rare Disease Advisory Council and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 256 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/sfa1 RSN# 811 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/sfa1 RSN# 811 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | Senate | signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 032) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2019-03-07 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2019-03-07 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2019-03-07 | Senate | received in Senate |
2019-03-07 | House | 3rd reading, passed 99-0 |
2019-03-06 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 7, 2019 |
2019-03-05 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-03-04 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2019-02-28 | House | posted in committee |
2019-02-21 | House | to Health and Family Services (H) |
2019-02-20 | House | received in House |
2019-02-19 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 with floor amendment (1) |
2019-02-15 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 19, 2019 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed |
2019-02-14 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-13 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2019-01-08 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2019-01-08 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
2018-08-21 | Senate | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |
Subjects
Appropriations
Diseases
Health and Medical Services
Hospitals and Nursing Homes
Physicians and Practitioners
Public Health
Reports Mandated
Diseases
Health and Medical Services
Hospitals and Nursing Homes
Physicians and Practitioners
Public Health
Reports Mandated