KY SB159 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-30 - posted for passage for concurrence in House floor amendments (1), (3) and (4-title)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-30 - posted for passage for concurrence in House floor amendments (1), (3) and (4-title)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 36.010 to reassign divisions in the Office of Management and Administration to the Office of the Adjutant General; repeal KRS 36.250, 36.255, 36.260, 36.265, and 36.270, relating to the Kentucky Community Crisis Response Board; and confirm Executive Order 2020-1035.
Title
AN ACT relating to reorganization.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 452 (Y: 70 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 sfa1 RSN# 1624 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 sfa1 RSN# 1624 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-30 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House floor amendments (1), (3) and (4-title) |
2021-03-30 | Senate | to Rules (S) |
2021-03-30 | Senate | received in Senate |
2021-03-30 | House | 3rd reading, passed 70-14 with floor amendments (1), (3) and (4-title) |
2021-03-29 | House | floor amendments (2), (3) and (4-title) filed |
2021-03-15 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day |
2021-03-15 | House | taken from Rules |
2021-03-12 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-03-11 | House | floor amendment (1) filed |
2021-03-11 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2021-03-05 | House | posted in committee |
2021-03-05 | House | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (H) |
2021-03-04 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-03-04 | House | received in House |
2021-03-03 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 30-0 with Committee Substitute and floor amendment (1) |
2021-03-01 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 3, 2021 |
2021-02-26 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2021-02-26 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-02-25 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2021-02-09 | Senate | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2021-02-03 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2021-02-03 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Advisory Boards, Commissions, and Committees
Boards and Commissions
Military Affairs and Civil Defense
Reorganization
Boards and Commissions
Military Affairs and Civil Defense
Reorganization