KY SB155 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repeal and reenact KRS 355.2-102 to establish transactions subject to provisions of article; amend various sections of Articles 2, 2A, 4A, and 9 of KRS Chapter 355 to remove writing requirements; amend KRS 355.2A-102 to establish when article applies to hybrid leases; amend definition of "negotiable instrument" in KRS 355.3-104; amend KRS 355.3-105 and 355.3-604 to accommodate electronic transactions; amend KRS 355.3-417 and 355.4-208 to specify that expenses include reasonable attorney's fees; amend KRS 355.4A-201 to modify security procedure requirements relating to funds transfers; amend KRS 355.5-116 to establish governing law standards for letters of credit; amend KRS 355.7-106 and 355.8-106, repeal and reenact KRS 355.9-105, and create new sections of Article 9 of KRS Chapter 355, to establish control requirements for electronic documents of title, security entitlements, records evidencing chattel paper, electronic money, controllable electronic records, controllable accounts, and controllable payment intangibles; amend governing law standards for certain securities transactions in KRS 355.8-110; amend KRS 355.9-104 to expand when a security party has control of a deposit account; amend KRS 355.9-204 to establish exception to after-acquired property clause limitation; amend governing law standards for banks and securities and commodity entities in KRS 355.9-304 and 355.9-305; create new sections of Article 9 of KRS Chapter 355 to establish certain perfection and priority jurisdictional rules for chattel paper, controllable electronic records, controllable accounts, and controllable payment intangibles; amend KRS 355.9-203, 355.9-207, 355.9-208, 355.9-209, 355.9-310, 355.9-312, 355.9-314, 355.9-316, 355.9-317, 355.9-330, 355.9-331, 355.9-332, 355.9-406, 355.9-408, 355.9-605, and 355.9-628, and create new sections of Article 9 of KRS Chapter 355, to govern security interests in controllable electronic records, electronic money, controllable accounts, controllable payment intangibles, electronic documents, and chattel paper; amend KRS 355.9-323 to remove exception for buyers and lessees in the ordinary course of business relating to certain future advances clauses; amend notification of disposition of collateral requirements in KRS 355.9-613 and 355.9-614; establish a new Article 12 of KRS Chapter 355, titled "Controllable Electronic Records"; establish definitions, scope, purchaser rights, control requirements, debtor discharge obligations, and jurisdictional rules relating to controllable electronic records, controllable accounts, and controllable payment intangibles; create new sections of Article 11 of KRS Chapter 355; title Article 11 "Transitional Provisions for Uniform Commercial Code Amendments (2022)"; establish definitions and transitional provisions for transactions, liens, and interests entered, created, or acquired before the effective date of this Act; amend various sections of Articles 1, 2, 2A, 3, 5, 7, 8, and 9 of KRS Chapter 355 to make definitional revisions and conforming amendments; amend KRS 367.976 and 369.116 to conform; make technical corrections throughout; provide construction clause relating to a national digital currency; EFFECTIVE January 1, 2025.
Title
AN ACT relating to the Uniform Commercial Code.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 323 (Y: 72 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2927 (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2927 (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | Senate | signed by Governor |
2024-03-22 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2024-03-22 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2024-03-22 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2024-03-22 | Senate | received in Senate |
2024-03-21 | House | 3rd reading, passed 72-21 |
2024-03-21 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day |
2024-03-21 | House | taken from Rules |
2024-03-14 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-03-13 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2024-03-12 | House | to Banking & Insurance (H) |
2024-02-23 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-02-23 | House | received in House |
2024-02-22 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 29-8 |
2024-02-20 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 22, 2024 |
2024-02-16 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-02-15 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2024-02-02 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2024-01-31 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-01-31 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Banks and Financial Institutions
Contracts
Effective Dates, Delayed
Liens
Loans and Credit
Negotiable Instruments
Securities
Technical Corrections
Technology
Uniform Laws
Contracts
Effective Dates, Delayed
Liens
Loans and Credit
Negotiable Instruments
Securities
Technical Corrections
Technology
Uniform Laws