KY SB154 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-22 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 59)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-22 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 59)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 216.935 to change the definition of "home health aide services" to include the assisting of patients with medication ordinarily self-administered that has been specifically ordered by a physician assistant; amend KRS 304.17-312 to change the definition of "home health care" to include care and treatment provided by a home health agency which is prescribed and supervised by an advanced practice registered nurse or a physician assistant and to change the definition of "home health aide services" to include the assisting of patients with medication ordinarily self-administered that has been specifically ordered by an advanced nurse practitioner or a physician assistant; amend KRS 304.17-313 to allow home health care reimbursement if certified by an advanced practice registered nurse or a physician assistant; amend KRS 304.18-037 to allow home health care reimbursement if certified by an advanced practice registered nurse or a physician assistant; amend KRS 304.38-210 to allow home health care reimbursement if certified by an advanced practice registered nurse or a physician assistant.
Title
AN ACT relating to home health care and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 334 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 scta1 RSN# 1567 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 scta1 RSN# 1567 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-22 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 59) |
2021-03-15 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2021-03-15 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2021-03-15 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2021-03-15 | Senate | received in Senate |
2021-03-15 | House | 3rd reading, passed 96-0 |
2021-03-12 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 15, 2021 |
2021-03-12 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-03-11 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2021-03-03 | House | posted in committee |
2021-03-03 | House | to Health & Family Services (H) |
2021-02-25 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-02-25 | House | received in House |
2021-02-24 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 24, 2021 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-02-10 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Health and Medical Services
Health Benefit Mandate
Insurance, Health
Nurses
Physicians and Practitioners
Health Benefit Mandate
Insurance, Health
Nurses
Physicians and Practitioners