KY SB153 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-21 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 52)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-21 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 52)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 164 establishing a comprehensive funding model for the allocation of state appropriations to public postsecondary institutions based on student success, course completion, and other components; establish the public university sector formula and the KCTCS sector formula in the model and require 100% of allocable resources to be distributed through the formulas; establish the funding parameters for each formula; direct the Council on Postsecondary Education to implement the funding model; include hold-harmless and stop-loss provisions in the formulas through 2021; require the Council on Postsecondary Education to establish a working group to review the model every three years; direct the Office of the State Budget Director to distribute the funds as determined by the model, including the performance funds appropriated in the 2016 budget bill; establish the Postsecondary Education Performance Fund for distribution of the funds allocated through the model; APPROPRIATION; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to postsecondary funding, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-21 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 52) |
2017-03-14 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2017-03-14 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2017-03-14 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2017-03-14 | Senate | received in Senate |
2017-03-14 | House | 3rd reading, passed 65-29 |
2017-03-08 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 14, 2017 |
2017-03-08 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-03-07 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2017-03-03 | House | posted in committee |
2017-02-28 | House | reassigned to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2017-02-27 | House | to Education (H) |
2017-02-22 | House | received in House |
2017-02-22 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-1 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 22, 2017 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules |
2017-02-17 | Senate | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2017-02-17 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2017-02-17 | Senate | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | 1st reading |
2017-02-16 | Senate | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2017-02-10 | Senate | introduced in Senate |