KY SB150 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-09 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 67)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-09 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 67)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 359.200 to define "electronic mail" and "verified mail"; amend KRS 359.230 to allow the use of verified or electronic mail in self-storage lien notices and allow for the towing of motor vehicles or watercraft in lieu of authorized sale in the event of default; create a new section of KRS Chapter 359 to authorize the imposition of late fees pursuant to a self-storage rental agreement and limit the value of the late fees to twenty dollars or twenty percent of the value of the monthly rental fee; allow the operator of a self-storage facility to recover reasonable costs in the event of a default.
Title
AN ACT relating to self-storage liens.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-09 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 67) |
2014-03-28 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2014-03-28 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2014-03-27 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2014-03-27 | Senate | received in Senate |
2014-03-27 | House | 3rd reading, passed 100-0 |
2014-03-26 | House | placed in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 27, 2014 |
2014-03-26 | House | taken from Rules |
2014-03-26 | House | reported favorably, to Rules as a Consent Bill |
2014-03-25 | House | returned to Judiciary (H) |
2014-03-25 | House | 2nd reading |
2014-03-25 | House | taken from Judiciary (H) |
2014-03-24 | House | posted in committee |
2014-03-24 | House | returned to Judiciary (H) |
2014-03-24 | House | 1st reading |
2014-03-24 | House | taken from Judiciary (H) |
2014-03-17 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2014-03-13 | House | received in House |
2014-03-13 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 with Committee Substitute |
2014-03-13 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 13, 2014 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute as a Consent Bill |
2014-03-12 | Senate | returned to Judiciary (S) |
2014-03-12 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2014-03-12 | Senate | taken from Judiciary (S) |
2014-03-11 | Senate | returned to Judiciary (S) |
2014-03-11 | Senate | 1st reading |
2014-03-11 | Senate | taken from Judiciary (S) |
2014-02-26 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2014-02-20 | Senate | introduced in Senate |