KY SB148 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 172)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 172)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS 65.870 to 65.879 to establish definitions and requirements on a local government related to certified family child-care homes; amend KRS 199.896 to specify the topics that the Cabinet for Health and Family Services may promulgate administrative regulations related to child-care centers; specify that total number of children and specific class and group sizes for child-care centers cannot be below the level in place on February 1, 2020, except for a period of 30 days; amend KRS 199.8982 related to requirements on a local government regulating certified family child-care homes; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to child care and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - House - House: Veto Override RCS# 428 (Y: 74 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 427 (Y: 69 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1801 (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 358 (Y: 81 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 sfa1 RSN# 1566 (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 427 (Y: 69 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1801 (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 358 (Y: 81 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 sfa1 RSN# 1566 (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-30 | House | delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 172) |
2021-03-30 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2021-03-30 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2021-03-30 | House | received in Senate |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Bill passed 74-18 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | veto overridden |
2021-03-29 | Senate | posted for passage for consideration of Governor's veto |
2021-03-29 | Senate | to Rules (H) |
2021-03-29 | Senate | received in House |
2021-03-29 | House | Bill passed 33-4 |
2021-03-29 | House | veto overridden |
2021-03-29 | House | posted for consideration of Governor's veto |
2021-03-29 | House | to Rules (S) |
2021-03-29 | House | received in Senate |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Vetoed |
2021-03-16 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2021-03-16 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2021-03-16 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2021-03-16 | Senate | received in Senate |
2021-03-16 | House | 3rd reading, passed 81-14 |
2021-03-16 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day |
2021-03-16 | House | taken from Rules |
2021-03-12 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-03-11 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2021-03-02 | House | posted in committee |
2021-02-26 | House | to Health & Family Services (H) |
2021-02-25 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-02-25 | House | received in House |
2021-02-24 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 34-1 with Committee Substitute (1) floor amendment (1) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2021-02-22 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 24, 2021 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-02-10 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Administrative Regulations and Proceedings
Children and Minors
Cities
Counties
Effective Dates, Emergency
Local Mandate
State Agencies
Children and Minors
Cities
Counties
Effective Dates, Emergency
Local Mandate
State Agencies