KY SB138 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-15 - recommitted to Education (S)
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-15 - recommitted to Education (S)
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 156 to require the Kentucky Board of Education to promulgate administrative regulations to establish an elective social studies course on the Hebrew Scriptures, Old Testament of the Bible, the New Testament, or a combination of the Hebrew Scriptures and the New Testament of the Bible; require that the course provide to students knowledge of biblical content, characters, poetry, and narratives that are prerequisites to understanding contemporary society and culture, including literature, art, music, mores, oratory, and public policy; permit students to use various translations of the Bible for the course; amend KRS 158.197 to permit a school council to offer an elective social studies course on the Hebrew Scriptures, Old Testament of the Bible, the New Testament, or a combination of the Hebrew Scriptures and the New Testament of the Bible.
Title
AN ACT relating to Bible literacy courses in the public schools.
Sponsors
Sen. Robin Webb [D] | Sen. Danny Carroll [R] | Sen. C.B. Embry [R] | Sen. Stephen Meredith [R] |
Sen. Whitney Westerfield [R] | Sen. Mike Wilson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-15 | Senate | recommitted to Education (S) |
2017-02-17 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-02-16 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2017-02-09 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2017-02-08 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/17RS/SB138.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/SB138/bill.pdf |