KY SB134 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - received in House
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

Create new sections of KRS Chapter 314 to define "APRN-designated certified nurse midwife," "certified professional midwife," "certified professional midwifery services," and "council"; create the Certified Professional Midwives Advisory Council under the Board of Nursing and establish its membership; provide that a certified professional midwife has same authority and responsibility as other licensed health care providers regarding public health laws and require each to keep appropriate medical records; require the board to promulgate administrative regulations relating to certified professional midwives, including a requirement for informed consent, fees for permits, statewide requirements for emergency transfer of care, medical tests, and a formulary of medications; permit the board to require a criminal background investigation of an applicant for a permit as a certified professional midwife by means of a fingerprint check; require the council to delineate findings on restrictions to providing certified professional midwifery services; provide immunity from liability in civil action for health care providers who have acted in consultation with a certified professional midwife; amend KRS 164.298, 211.180, 311.271, and 311.550 to conform.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to permits for certified professional midwives.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SCS 1 RSN# 647 (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate: Adopt SFA 1 TO W/ SCS 1 RSN# 646 (Y: 18 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27Housereceived in House
2018-03-27Senatepassed 29-8 with Committee Substitute (1)
2018-03-27Senatefloor amendment (1) defeated
2018-03-27Senate3rd reading
2018-03-22Senatepassed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
2018-03-22Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 22, 2018
2018-03-20Senatefloor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
2018-03-20Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2018-03-19Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2018-02-14Senateto Health & Welfare (S)
2018-02-07Senateintroduced in Senate

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback