KY SB128 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-22 - signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 110)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-22 - signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 110)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 186.412, regarding operators' licenses, to allow a DD-2 form to be used as acceptable proof of veteran status for placing a veteran designation on a license or ID card.
Title
AN ACT relating to veterans designations on operators' licenses and personal identification cards.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-22 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 110) |
2013-03-12 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2013-03-12 | Senate | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2013-03-12 | Senate | received in Senate |
2013-03-12 | House | 3rd reading, passed 99-0 |
2013-03-11 | House | placed in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 12, 2013 |
2013-03-11 | House | taken from Rules |
2013-03-07 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a Consent Bill |
2013-03-05 | House | posting waived |
2013-03-05 | House | recommitted to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Safety (H) |
2013-03-05 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2013-02-28 | House | posted in committee |
2013-02-25 | House | to Transportation (H) |
2013-02-21 | House | received in House |
2013-02-20 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 |
2013-02-19 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 20, 2013 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2013-02-13 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2013-02-12 | Senate | to Transportation (S) |
2013-02-11 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/13RS/SB128.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/13RS/SB128/bill.doc |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/13RS/SB128/vote_history.pdf |