KY SB126 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-10 - returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
Pending: Senate Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-10 - returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
Pending: Senate Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 143A.010 to expand the definition of "processing" to include unloading or loading natural resources that have not been severed in Kentucky; amend KRS 143A.035 to allow a tax credit against the tax imposed on limestone when a similar tax has been paid to another state for that limestone and to make technical corrections; provide effective date of August 1, 2010.
Title
AN ACT relating to the natural resources severance and processing tax.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-10 | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S) | |
2010-03-10 | 1st reading | |
2010-03-10 | taken from committee | |
2010-02-03 | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) | |
2010-02-01 | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/SB126.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/SB126/bill.doc |