KY SB124 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - recommitted to Agriculture (S)
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - recommitted to Agriculture (S)
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 2 to designate the Garrard County Tobacco Cutting Contest as the official state tobacco cutting contest.
Title
AN ACT designating the Garrard County Tobacco Cutting Contest as the official state tobacco cutting contest.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Buford [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | recommitted to Agriculture (S) |
2020-03-11 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-03-10 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2020-02-03 | Senate | to Agriculture (S) |
2020-01-30 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/20RS/sb124.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/20RS/sb124/orig_bill.pdf |