KY SB111 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-24 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 124)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-24 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 124)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 72 to require the coroner to deliver the remains of police officers, firefighters, and emergency medical services personnel, as defined in KRS 61.315, killed in the line of duty to the family or other responsible entities in a casket or other similar vessel covered in an American flag; specify that the county is responsible for any costs associated with obtaining the flag and the casket or similar vessel, but that the county has no obligation to purchase the flag or the casket for the actual burial, cremation, or other disposition of the remains.
Title
AN ACT relating to public safety personnel.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1461 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 367 (Y: 84 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs 1, scta 1 RSN# 1239 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 367 (Y: 84 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs 1, scta 1 RSN# 1239 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-24 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 124) |
2020-04-15 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2020-04-15 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2020-04-15 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2020-04-15 | Senate | passed 33-0 |
2020-04-15 | Senate | Senate concurred in House floor amendments (1) and (4-title) |
2020-04-15 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House floor amendments (1) and (4-title) |
2020-04-15 | Senate | to Rules (S) |
2020-04-15 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-04-14 | House | 3rd reading, passed 84-2 with floor amendments (1) and (4-title) |
2020-04-14 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day |
2020-04-14 | House | taken from Rules |
2020-03-26 | House | floor amendments (1), (2), (3-title) and (4-title) filed |
2020-03-18 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-03-17 | House | returned to Local Government (H) |
2020-03-17 | House | 1st reading |
2020-03-17 | House | taken from Local Government (H) |
2020-02-28 | House | posted in committee |
2020-02-21 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2020-02-19 | House | received in House |
2020-02-19 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 34-0 with Committee Substitute (1) committee amendment (1-title) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 19, 2020 |
2020-02-14 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-02-13 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2020-01-30 | Senate | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2020-01-24 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Aeronautics and Aviation
Cities
Coroners
Corrections and Correctional Facilities, State
Counties
Deaths
Emergency Medical Services
Firefighters and Fire Departments
Jails and Jailers
Local Government
Local Mandate
Police, City and County
Police, State
Sheriffs
Cities
Coroners
Corrections and Correctional Facilities, State
Counties
Deaths
Emergency Medical Services
Firefighters and Fire Departments
Jails and Jailers
Local Government
Local Mandate
Police, City and County
Police, State
Sheriffs