KY SB111 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-22 - recommitted to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S)
Pending: Senate Licensing, Occupations & Administrative Regulations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-22 - recommitted to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S)
Pending: Senate Licensing, Occupations & Administrative Regulations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 316.130 to eliminate the 6-hour, in-person continuing education requirement for funeral directors and embalmers.
Title
AN ACT relating to continuing education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-22 | Senate | recommitted to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S) |
2019-02-22 | Senate | taken from the Regular Orders of the Day |
2019-02-21 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 22, 2019 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-19 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2019-02-08 | Senate | to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/19RS/sb111.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/19RS/sb111/orig_bill.pdf |