KY SB110 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-17 - recommitted to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-17 - recommitted to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Create new sections of KRS Chapter 381 to define heir property and create a mechanism for partition or sale among cotenants by the court; create requirements for notice and determination of value through agreement or appraisal; create protocol for buyouts, partition alternatives, partition in kind, sale by open market, sealed bids, or auction; create the heir property research fund; amend KRS 324B.050 to authorize the Kentucky Real Estate Authority to promulgate administrative regulations to issue grants from the fund; amend KRS 64.012 to increase the recording and indexing fee collected by county clerks by $1 and to direct those extra funds to the heir property research fund; amend KRS 381.135 and 389A.030 to conform; APPROPRIATION.
Title
AN ACT relating to heir property and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | Senate | recommitted to Judiciary (S) |
2022-02-25 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-02-24 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2022-01-26 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2022-01-24 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-01-24 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Administrative Regulations and Proceedings
Appropriations
Civil Actions
Civil Procedure
County Clerks
Deeds and Conveyances
Fees
Local Mandate
Property
Real Estate
Uniform Laws
Appropriations
Civil Actions
Civil Procedure
County Clerks
Deeds and Conveyances
Fees
Local Mandate
Property
Real Estate
Uniform Laws