KY SB11 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-16 - to Committee on Committees (H)
Pending: House Committee On Committees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-16 - to Committee on Committees (H)
Pending: House Committee On Committees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 56.580 to prohibit closing portions of Capital Avenue in Frankfort; provide exceptions for emergency personnel.
Title
AN ACT relating to the control of vehicular traffic.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2478 (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-16 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2023-02-16 | House | received in House |
2023-02-15 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 28-6 |
2023-02-14 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2023-02-10 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 14, 2023 |
2023-02-10 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2023-02-09 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2023-01-05 | Senate | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2023-01-04 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2023-01-04 | Senate | introduced in Senate |