KY SB1 | 2021 | 1st Special Sesison
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-09 - delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 4)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-09 - delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 4)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Create new sections of KRS Chapter 13A to nullify 902 KAR 2:213E and 702 KAR 1:195E; direct each school district to have a COVID-19 operations in place; direct the Department for Public Health to develop a model "test to stay" COVID-19 model for school districts; direct local health departments to assist school districts in implementing their COVID-19 operation plans; provide a temporary remote instruction option for school districts to use at the school, classroom, grade, or group level; provide that districts may submit 2018-2019 or 2019-2020 attendance data for the 2021-2022 school year; require all certified staff and classified staff designated by a school district to work on-site during a nontraditional instruction day; for the 2021-2022 school year, temporarily revise requirements for emergency substitute certification, allow instructional activities to be performed by classified staff, and allow a district to temporarily hire staff upon receipt of a preliminary background check; direct the Kentucky State Police and Cabinet for Health and Family Services to prioritize school district background checks; temporarily revise retirement reemployment provisions until January 15, 2022; allow a school district to submit a school calendar plan to receive a waiver of 170 required student attendance days if 1,062 hours are achieved for the 2021-2022 school year; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to the delivery of education and care for children and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. George Wise [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-09-09 - House - House: Procedural Vote RCS# 8 (Y: 67 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-09-09 - House - House: Veto Override RCS# 29 (Y: 69 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-09-09 - Senate - Senate: Veto Override RSN# 1931 (Y: 21 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-09-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 16 (Y: 70 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-09-09 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 15 (Y: 14 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 60) [FAIL]
2021-09-09 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 14 (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 60) [PASS]
2021-09-09 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 13 (Y: 23 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 47) [FAIL]
2021-09-09 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 12 (Y: 27 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 49) [PASS]
2021-09-09 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 11 (Y: 24 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 48) [FAIL]
2021-09-09 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 10 (Y: 31 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [FAIL]
2021-09-09 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 9 (Y: 24 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [FAIL]
2021-09-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 1926 (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-09-09 - House - House: Veto Override RCS# 29 (Y: 69 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-09-09 - Senate - Senate: Veto Override RSN# 1931 (Y: 21 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-09-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 16 (Y: 70 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-09-09 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 15 (Y: 14 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 60) [FAIL]
2021-09-09 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 14 (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 60) [PASS]
2021-09-09 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 13 (Y: 23 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 47) [FAIL]
2021-09-09 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 12 (Y: 27 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 49) [PASS]
2021-09-09 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 11 (Y: 24 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 48) [FAIL]
2021-09-09 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 10 (Y: 31 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [FAIL]
2021-09-09 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 9 (Y: 24 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [FAIL]
2021-09-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 1926 (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-09 | House | delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 4) |
2021-09-09 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2021-09-09 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2021-09-09 | House | received in Senate |
2021-09-09 | Senate | Bill passed 69-24 |
2021-09-09 | Senate | veto overridden |
2021-09-09 | Senate | posted for passage for consideration of Governor's veto |
2021-09-09 | Senate | received in House |
2021-09-09 | House | Bill passed 21-6 |
2021-09-09 | House | veto overridden |
2021-09-09 | House | posted for passage for consideration of Governor's veto |
2021-09-09 | House | received in Senate |
2021-09-09 | Senate | Vetoed |
2021-09-09 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2021-09-09 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2021-09-09 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2021-09-09 | Senate | received in Senate |
2021-09-09 | House | passed 70-25 |
2021-09-09 | House | 2nd and 3rd readings dispensed with |
2021-09-09 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day |
2021-09-09 | House | floor amendments (1) (2) (3) (4) (5) (6) (7) (8) (9) (10) (11) and (12) filed |
2021-09-09 | House | substituted for identical House Bill 1 |
2021-09-09 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2021-09-09 | House | to Education (H) |
2021-09-09 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-09-09 | House | received in House |
2021-09-09 | Senate | passed 28-8 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2021-09-09 | Senate | floor amendments (1) (2) (3) (4) (5) (6) and (7) ruled out of order |
2021-09-09 | Senate | 3rd reading |
2021-09-09 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, September 9, 2021 |
2021-09-09 | Senate | floor amendments (8) (9) (10) (11) (12) (13) (14) (15) and (16) filed to Committee Substitute |
2021-09-09 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute |
2021-09-08 | Senate | recommitted to Education (S) |
2021-09-08 | Senate | floor amendments (4), (5), (6), and (7) filed |
2021-09-08 | Senate | returned to Rules |
2021-09-08 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2021-09-08 | Senate | taken from Rules (S) |
2021-09-07 | Senate | floor amendments (1), (2), and (3) filed |
2021-09-07 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules |
2021-09-07 | Senate | returned to Education (S) |
2021-09-07 | Senate | 1st reading |
2021-09-07 | Senate | taken from Education (S) |
2021-09-07 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2021-09-07 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2021-09-07 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Administrative Regulations and Proceedings
Background Checks
Children and Minors
Education, Elementary and Secondary
Effective Dates, Emergency
Public Health
Retirement and Pensions
State Agencies
Teachers
Background Checks
Children and Minors
Education, Elementary and Secondary
Effective Dates, Emergency
Public Health
Retirement and Pensions
State Agencies
Teachers