KY HR3 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - adopted by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Recognize March 23, 2021, as National Agriculture Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A RESOLUTION recognizing March 23, 2021, as National Agriculture Day.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-11Houseadopted by voice vote
2021-02-25Houseto House Floor
2021-02-25House2nd reading, to Rules
2021-02-24Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2021-02-02Houseposted in committee
2021-02-02Houseto Agriculture (H)
2021-01-06Houseto Committee on Committees (H)
2021-01-06Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback