KY HJR185 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-27 - reported favorably, to Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-27 - reported favorably, to Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Urge Kentucky State Parks to conduct internal review of processes necessary for public/private partnerships.
Title
Urge Kentucky State Parks to conduct internal review of processes necessary for public/private partnerships.
Sponsors
Rep. John Tilley [D] | Rep. Kenny Imes [R] | Rep. Lynn Bechler [R] | Rep. Will Coursey [D] |
Rep. Richard Heath [R] | Rep. Gary Herald [R] | Rep. Kim King [R] | Rep. Martha King [D] |
Rep. Tim Moore [R] | Rep. David Osborne [R] | Rep. Fitz Steele [D] | Rep. Gerald Watkins [D] |
Rep. Brent Yonts [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-27 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules |
2014-03-25 | Senate | returned to Economic Development, Tourism & Labor (S) |
2014-03-25 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2014-03-25 | Senate | taken from Economic Development, Tourism & Labor (S) |
2014-03-24 | Senate | returned to Economic Development, Tourism & Labor (S) |
2014-03-24 | Senate | 1st reading |
2014-03-24 | Senate | taken from Economic Development, Tourism & Labor (S) |
2014-03-21 | Senate | to Economic Development, Tourism & Labor (S) |
2014-03-19 | Senate | received in Senate |
2014-03-18 | House | 3rd reading, adopted 95-0 with floor amendment (1) |
2014-03-17 | House | floor amendment (1) filed |
2014-03-14 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day |
2014-03-14 | House | taken from Rules |
2014-03-14 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-03-13 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2014-03-11 | House | posted in committee |
2014-03-05 | House | to State Government (H) |
2014-03-04 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/HJ185.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/HJ185/bill.doc |
Amendment | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/HJ185/HFA1.doc |