KY HCR47 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 27)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 27)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Encourage school districts to buy foods locally for school meals.
Title
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION commending Madison County Schools for using the farm-to-school concept for school meals and encouraging other school districts to do so.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2151 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House: Adopt RCS# 126 (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House: Adopt RCS# 126 (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 27) |
2022-03-21 | House | delivered to Governor |
2022-03-21 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2022-03-21 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2022-03-17 | House | received in House |
2022-03-17 | Senate | adopted 36-0 |
2022-03-14 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 17, 2022 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules as a consent bill |
2022-02-17 | Senate | to Agriculture (S) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | received in Senate |
2022-02-14 | House | 3rd reading, adopted 91-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2022-02-10 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 11, 2022 |
2022-02-10 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-02-09 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2022-02-03 | House | to Agriculture (H) |
2022-01-24 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-01-24 | House | introduced in House |